Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1457 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14863 Week
» 67879 Month
» 187406 Year
» 3214259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1998 |
14/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47296 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/06/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/06/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xih |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1998 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47296 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
07/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
31/07/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47296 |
|
|
19/08/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Southampton Steel: at Southampton Maritime |
|
|