Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 612 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1871 Week
» 24852 Month
» 388097 Year
» 464684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2 03/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44002 19/03/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
HELVELLYN 03/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/10/1959
Withdrawn 01/02/1979
Time in Service 19 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 10/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby w/e 26/09/1959
1B Camden (New) 03/10/1959
1B Camden w/e 07/05/1960
8A Edge Hill w/e 21/05/1960
1B Camden w/e 16/07/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 16/06/1962
18A Toton w/e 11/08/1962
5A Crewe North w/e 29/09/1962
18A Toton w/e 13/10/1962
1B Camden w/e 20/06/1964
16A Toton w/e 27/06/1964
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 01/02/1979


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
03/10/1959 To Service To service as D2, name: HELVELLYN
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/03/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop.   Link
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
23/02/1963 Modification Modification: Downrated to 2,300 h.p.    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
19/03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44002    
01/02/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 44002    
10/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev