|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 07/10/1959 | n/a | 07/10/1959 | 05/11/1959 | Light Casual | 25 days | 30 days | 127 | ||||
Derby Works | 22/04/1960 | 169 days | 22/04/1960 | 25/06/1960 | Heavy Casual | 55 days | 65 days | £686.00 | 17,334 | |||
Derby Works | 01/10/1960 | 98 days | 14/10/1960 | 22/10/1960 | Light Casual Uprated to 2,500 h.p. |
6 days | 7 days | 5 days | 9 days | £1,674.00 | 37,902 | |
Derby Works | 31/10/1960 | 9 days | 31/10/1960 | 04/11/1960 | Light Casual | 4 days | 5 days | £1,635.00 | 38,485 | |||
Crewe Works | 24/04/1961 | 171 days | 26/04/1961 | 02/05/1961 | Non Classified | 2 days | 3 days | 7 days | £102.00 | 72,048 | ||
Derby Works | 18/12/1961 | 230 days | 06/01/1962 | 02/02/1962 | Light Casual | 19 days | 20 days | 28 days | £1,743.00 | 106,532 | ||
Derby Works | 20/02/1962 | 18 days | 27/02/1962 | 30/03/1962 | Non Classified Engine hours recorder fitted |
5 days | 2 days | 26 days | 32 days | £536.00 | 109,231 | |
Derby Works | 03/06/1963 | 430 days | 06/06/1963 | 18/10/1963 | Heavy Casual SLM Exhausters |
1 day | 2 days | 115 days | 135 days | 138,610 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1959 | 5,117 | 5,117 | 6,270g | 0.82 | 25 | 25 | 48 | £292 | 4 | 77 | ||||
1960 | 37,787 | 42,904 | 36,831g | 1.03 | 6 | 7 | 64 | 77 | 80 | £1,146 | 15 | 172 | ||
1961 | 63,628 | 106,532 | ||||||||||||
1962 | 19,554 | 126,086 | ||||||||||||
1963 | 19,845 | 145,931 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/09/1959 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D2, name: HELVELLYN Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
||
26/09/1959 | Allocation | Loaned to Derby (17A) | ||
07/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. Stopped on 07/10/1959 |
||
22/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. Stopped on 22/04/1960 |
||
07/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
21/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
16/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
14/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1960. Dep: 22/10/1960. Stopped on 01/10/1960 Work undertaken: Uprated to 2,500 h.p. |
||
31/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1960. Dep: 04/11/1960. Stopped on 31/10/1960 |
||
05/11/1960 | Modification | Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted | ||
26/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 26/04/1961. Dep: 02/05/1961. Stopped on 24/04/1961 |
||
06/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1962. Dep: 02/02/1962. Stopped on 18/12/1961 |
||
27/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/02/1962. Dep: 30/03/1962. Stopped on 20/02/1962 Work undertaken: Engine hours recorder fitted |
||
03/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
21/04/1962 | Modification | Modification: Improved Water Fitting Arrangements | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
29/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
13/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
23/02/1963 | Modification | Modification: Downrated to 2,300 h.p. | ||
06/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1963. Dep: 18/10/1963. Stopped on 03/06/1963 Work undertaken: SLM Exhausters Modification: SLM Exhausters |
||
02/11/1963 | Modification | Modification: Bogie Frame Strengthening | ||
02/11/1963 | Modification | Modification: Steam heat boiler removed | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
27/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
16/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) | ||
05/1972 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front | ||
19/03/1974 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44002 | ||
01/02/1979 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44002 from Toton (TO) | ||
10/1979 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |