Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 576 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1710 Week
» 21443 Month
» 318457 Year
» 395044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D200 14/03/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40122 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 14/03/1958
Withdrawn 18/04/1988
Time in Service 30 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 14/03/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
31B March w/e 21/01/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 20/05/1967
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 05/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
9A Longsight w/e 30/12/1967
D09 Manchester Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 18/04/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/03/1958 To Service To service as D200
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40122    
18/04/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 40122    

prev