Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2114 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19917 Week
» 72933 Month
» 192460 Year
» 3219313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2000 |
12/12/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2000 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
24/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
07/05/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2000 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield |
|
|