Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2001 |
12/12/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2001 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
27/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2001 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|