Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16896 Week
» 69912 Month
» 189439 Year
» 3216292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2003 |
12/12/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2003 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
27/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
07/05/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2003 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ingot Metals: Kentish Town |
|
|