Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 869 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 13862 Month
» 321843 Year
» 1206224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2004 09/01/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03004 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/01/1958
Withdrawn 10/05/1976 off Cambridge (CA)
Time in Service 18 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 30/11/1976
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 09/01/1958
   Withdrawn 10/05/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1958 To Service To service as D2004
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03004    
10/05/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03004 from Cambridge (CA)    
30/11/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev