Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2005 09/01/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03005 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/01/1958
Withdrawn 05/11/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 09/01/1958
   Withdrawn 05/11/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1958 To Service To service as D2005
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03005    
05/11/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03005    
31/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev