Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2008 09/01/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03008 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/01/1958
Withdrawn 30/12/1978
Time in Service 20 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 09/01/1958
   Withdrawn 30/12/1978


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1958 To Service To service as D2008
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03008    
30/12/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 03008    
01/03/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev