Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 881 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 881 Week
» 23862 Month
» 387107 Year
» 463694 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D201 03/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40001 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 03/04/1958
Withdrawn 23/07/1984
Time in Service 26 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1987
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Information Life expired,and spares for D200
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 03/04/1958
34B Hornsey 4w/e 10/05/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 14/01/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 18/02/1967
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 05/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
9A Longsight w/e 30/12/1967
D09 Manchester Division 17/06/1968
55B York (North) w/e 23/05/1970
D09 Manchester Division w/e 06/06/1970
   Withdrawn 23/07/1984


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/04/1958 To Service To service as D201
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
14/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
18/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
27/07/1969 Sightings Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop RO 9/1969 Link
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
06/06/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40001    
23/07/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 40001    
01/02/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev