Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 595 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6572 Week
» 22770 Month
» 187670 Year
» 698772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2010 12/02/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03010 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 12/02/1958
Withdrawn 10/11/1974
Time in Service 16 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 31/05/1976
Cut At Unknown (Trieste, Italy)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 12/02/1958
31C Kings Lynn w/e 06/02/1960
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
TE Thornaby 3w/e 21/09/1974
   Withdrawn 10/11/1974


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/02/1958 To Service To service as D2010
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03010    
21/09/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
10/11/1974 Withdrawn Condemned as 03010    
31/05/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Unknown: Trieste, Italy    

prev prev