Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2013 18/03/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03013 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/03/1958
Withdrawn 18/07/1976
Time in Service 18 yrs , 4 mths
Cut Up 31/03/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 18/03/1958
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 10/05/1958
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
YK York (North) w/e 14/07/1973
   Withdrawn 18/07/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1958 To Service To service as D2013
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03013    
14/07/1973 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
18/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03013    
31/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev