Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 71 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7525 Week
» 10107 Month
» 274740 Year
» 1496305 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2014 18/03/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 03014 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 18/03/1958 to Cambridge (31A)
Withdrawn 30/06/1974
Time in Service 16 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 30/04/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) on 18/03/1958
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 10/05/1958
31B March w/e 17/09/1960
SF Stratford w/e 27/04/1974
   Withdrawn on 30/06/1974


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1958 To Service To service as D2014
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03014    
27/04/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
30/06/1974 Withdrawn Condemned as 03014    
30/04/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev