Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2015 |
18/03/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/03/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2015 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/07/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2015 |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|