Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2016 18/03/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03016 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 18/03/1958
Withdrawn 30/12/1978
Time in Service 20 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 31/05/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 18/03/1958
31D South Lynn 4w/e 10/05/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 07/03/1959
31B March w/e 12/11/1960
31A Cambridge w/e 23/02/1963
   Withdrawn 30/12/1978


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1958 To Service To service as D2016
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03016    
30/12/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 03016    
31/05/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev