Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1197 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19000 Week
» 72016 Month
» 191543 Year
» 3218396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2017 |
01/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03017 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2017 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03017 |
|
|
14/02/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03017 |
|
|
30/09/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|