Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2017 01/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03017 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/04/1958
Withdrawn 14/02/1982
Time in Service 23 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 30/09/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 01/04/1958
31D South Lynn 4w/e 10/05/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 07/03/1959
31B March w/e 10/09/1966
   Withdrawn 14/02/1982


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/04/1958 To Service To service as D2017
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03017    
14/02/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 03017    
30/09/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev