Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2018 14/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03018 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 14/04/1958
Withdrawn 09/11/1975
Time in Service 17 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34D Hitchin (GNR) (New) 14/04/1958
34C Hatfield 5w/e 14/06/1958
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 14/03/1959
40E Colwick w/e 22/08/1964
40B Immingham w/e 01/01/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/07/1966
   Withdrawn 09/11/1975

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/04/1958 To Service To service as D2018
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03018    
09/11/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03018    

prev prev