Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 798 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5399 Week
» 16946 Month
» 416628 Year
» 493215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D202 30/04/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40002 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 30/04/1958
Withdrawn 24/05/1984
Time in Service 26 yrs , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Information Bogie Fractures
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 30/04/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 05/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 12/08/1967
9A Longsight w/e 30/12/1967
D09 Manchester Division 17/06/1968
55B York (North) w/e 23/05/1970
D09 Manchester Division w/e 06/06/1970
HM Healey Mills 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 24/05/1984


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1958 To Service To service as D202
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
06/06/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40002    
07/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
24/05/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 40002    
01/03/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev