Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 907 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6512 Week
» 18059 Month
» 417741 Year
» 494328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2020 06/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03020 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 06/05/1958
Withdrawn 03/12/1975
Time in Service 17 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 06/05/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 30/07/1966
   Withdrawn 03/12/1975

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1958 To Service To service as D2020
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
30/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03020    
03/12/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 03020    

prev prev