Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 864 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1743 Week
» 10485 Month
» 354664 Year
» 865766 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2021 27/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03021 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 27/05/1958
Withdrawn 07/11/1982
Time in Service 24 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 12/03/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 27/05/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969
   Withdrawn 07/11/1982


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/05/1958 To Service To service as D2021
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03021    
07/11/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 03021    
12/03/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev