Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1218 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19021 Week
» 72037 Month
» 191564 Year
» 3218417 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2022 |
27/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03022 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
27/05/1958 to Immingham (40B) |
Withdrawn |
07/11/1982 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
12/11/1983 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2022 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03022 |
|
|
07/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03022 |
|
|
12/11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|