Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 76 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16638 Month
» 348127 Year
» 424714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2023 12/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 12/08/1958
Withdrawn 04/07/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (New) 12/08/1958
40A Lincoln 4w/e 13/09/1958
40B Immingham 4w/e 11/10/1958
40F Boston 5w/e 15/11/1958
40E Colwick w/e 11/01/1964
40B Immingham w/e 01/01/1966
40A Lincoln w/e 17/05/1969
   Withdrawn 04/07/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/08/1958 To Service To service as D2023
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
   
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/07/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2023    

prev prev