Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 586 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 586 Week
» 19912 Month
» 246673 Year
» 757775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2024 19/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 19/08/1958
Withdrawn 04/07/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40A Lincoln (New) 19/08/1958
40F Boston w/e 07/03/1959
40E Colwick w/e 17/06/1961
40B Immingham w/e 01/01/1966
40A Lincoln w/e 31/05/1969
   Withdrawn 04/07/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/08/1958 To Service To service as D2024
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Lincoln (40A)
   
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
31/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/07/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2024    

prev prev