Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1495 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14901 Week
» 67917 Month
» 187444 Year
» 3214297 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2026 |
05/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03026 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2026 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03026 |
|
|
06/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03026 |
|
|
30/04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|