Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2029 16/10/1958
TOPS (Tops) 03029 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/10/1958
Withdrawn 03/09/1979
Time in Service 20 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 16/10/1958
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 20/06/1959
34C Hatfield w/e 16/07/1960
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 07/01/1961
40A Lincoln w/e 03/03/1962
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 23/07/1966
   Withdrawn 03/09/1979


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1958 To Service To service as D2029
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03029    
03/09/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 03029    
01/11/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev