Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2880 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16286 Week
» 69302 Month
» 188829 Year
» 3215682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D203 |
16/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40003 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
16/05/1958 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
12/09/1982 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Bogie Fractures&power unit damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/05/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
15/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
06/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D203 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Loaned to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40003 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
12/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40003 |
|
|
01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|