Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 596 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6573 Week
» 22771 Month
» 187671 Year
» 698773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2031 13/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 13/11/1958
Withdrawn 07/05/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1969
Cut At Pollock and Brown (Southampton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31A Cambridge (New) 13/11/1958
31B March w/e 06/12/1958
34E New England w/e 07/11/1964
30A Stratford w/e 21/08/1965
70C Guildford w/e 28/05/1966
70C Guildford 4w/e 25/07/1966
75A Brighton 4w/e 19/09/1966
   Withdrawn 07/05/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1958 To Service To service as D2031
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cambridge (31A)
   
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
25/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
19/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
07/05/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2031    
01/09/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Pollock and Brown: Southampton    

prev prev