Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2034 21/01/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03034 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 21/01/1959
Withdrawn 06/02/1983
Time in Service 24 yrs , 16 dys
Cut Up 06/08/1983
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 21/01/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 31/12/1976
   Withdrawn 06/02/1983


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1959 To Service To service as D2034
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03034    
31/12/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03034    
06/02/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 03034    
06/08/1983 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev