Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2039 |
13/03/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2039 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/02/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2039 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|