Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 309 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3771 Week
» 23504 Month
» 320518 Year
» 397105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D204 30/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40004 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 30/05/1958
Withdrawn 02/09/1984
Time in Service 26 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Information Low profile on tyres,crap bogies,main generator,and poor power unit.
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 30/05/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/06/1959
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
91M To London Midland Region w/e 19/08/1967
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 19/08/1967
9A Longsight w/e 30/12/1967
D09 Manchester Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 02/09/1984

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1958 To Service To service as D204
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40004    
02/09/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 40004    
01/09/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev