Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 587 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 587 Week
» 19913 Month
» 246674 Year
» 757776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2041 13/04/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 13/04/1959
Withdrawn 01/02/1970
Time in Service 10 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 13/04/1959
75C Norwood Junction w/e 28/05/1966
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 25/07/1966
70C Guildford 4w/e 19/09/1966
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75C Selhurst w/e 30/09/1968
   Withdrawn 01/02/1970

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/04/1959 To Service To service as D2041
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
28/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
25/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
19/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
30/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
01/02/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2041    

prev prev