Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 574 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19485 Week
» 84439 Month
» 287103 Year
» 3313956 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2045 |
06/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03045 |
21/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2045 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03045 |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
04/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/02/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03045 |
|
|
09/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|