Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 595 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6572 Week
» 22770 Month
» 187670 Year
» 698772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2046 13/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 13/12/1958
Withdrawn 03/10/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52F Blyth (North) (New) 13/12/1958
50A York (North) w/e 20/06/1959
51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967
   Withdrawn 03/10/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1958 To Service To service as D2046
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Blyth (North) (52F)
   
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2046    

prev prev