Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 253 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2818 Week
» 1556 Month
» 415877 Year
» 1637442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2047 19/12/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 03047 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0319/12/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 19/12/1958 to Heaton (52B)
Withdrawn 30/07/1979
Time in Service 20 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52B Heaton (New) on 19/12/1958
52G Sunderland w/e 19/09/1959
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
52A Gateshead w/e 18/07/1964
55B York (North) 4w/e 20/07/1968
55C Healey Mills w/e 14/12/1968
   Withdrawn on 30/07/1979


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2047
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Heaton (52B)
   
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
14/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03047 (Tops)    
30/07/1979 Withdrawn Condemned as 03047    
01/10/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev