Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 773 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18576 Week
» 71592 Month
» 191119 Year
» 3217972 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D205 |
25/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40005 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
25/06/1958 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
24/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
25/06/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D205 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40005 |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
11/01/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
24/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40005 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|