Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 113 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4073 Week
» 33659 Month
» 407672 Year
» 1629237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2050 17/01/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 03050 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0317/01/1959
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 17/01/1959 to Blaydon (52C)
Withdrawn 07/08/1978
Time in Service 19 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1979
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52C Blaydon (New) on 17/01/1959
52G Sunderland w/e 19/09/1959
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/11/1971
   Withdrawn on 07/08/1978


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
17/01/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2050
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Blaydon (52C)
   
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
20/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03050 (Tops)    
07/08/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 03050    
01/05/1979 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev