Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2051 27/01/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 27/01/1959
Withdrawn 14/12/1972
Time in Service 13 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 27/01/1959
55F Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 04/04/1970
30E Colchester w/e 13/03/1971
   Withdrawn 14/12/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/01/1959 To Service To service as D2051
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
04/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
13/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
14/12/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D2051    

prev prev