Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1654 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19457 Week
» 72473 Month
» 192000 Year
» 3218853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2051 |
27/01/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2051 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
13/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
14/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2051 from Colchester (30E) |
|
|