Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2056 09/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03056 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 09/05/1959
Withdrawn 15/06/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1981
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) 09/05/1959
   Withdrawn 15/06/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/05/1959 To Service To service as D2056
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03056    
15/06/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 03056    
01/03/1981 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev