Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2059 29/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03059 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 29/05/1959
Withdrawn 05/07/1987
Time in Service 28 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys
Cut Up 24/10/1990
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) 29/05/1959
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 19/11/1966
   Withdrawn 05/07/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1959 To Service To service as D2059
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
19/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 03059    
05/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 03059    

prev prev