Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 595 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6572 Week
» 22770 Month
» 187670 Year
» 698772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2061 20/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03061 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 20/06/1959
Withdrawn 12/10/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 31/07/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) 20/06/1959
56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 25/02/1967
51L Thornaby 4w/e 24/02/1968
52A Gateshead w/e 06/05/1972
   Withdrawn 12/10/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/06/1959 To Service To service as D2061
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03061    
12/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 03061    
31/07/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev