Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 587 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 587 Week
» 19913 Month
» 246674 Year
» 757776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2062 03/07/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03062 12/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 03/07/1959
Withdrawn 12/10/1980
Time in Service 21 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50C Selby (New) 03/07/1959
50A York (North) w/e 11/07/1959
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 01/03/1969
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 13/12/1969
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/10/1970
   Withdrawn 12/10/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1959 To Service To service as D2062
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Selby (50C)
   
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
13/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
24/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 03062    
12/10/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 03062    

prev prev