Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2063 14/07/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03063 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 14/07/1959
Withdrawn 26/11/1987
Time in Service 28 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 14/07/1959
55F Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 22/06/1968
55B York (North) w/e 12/04/1969
BG Hull Botanic Gardens 3w/e 04/01/1976
   Withdrawn 26/11/1987

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/07/1959 To Service To service as D2063
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
22/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
07/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/04/1969 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03063    
04/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)    
26/11/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 03063    

prev prev