Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 171 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17974 Week
» 70990 Month
» 190517 Year
» 3217370 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2065 |
11/08/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2065 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2065 from Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|