Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 227 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 227 Week
» 11774 Month
» 411456 Year
» 488043 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2066 17/08/1959
TOPS (Tops) 03066 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 17/08/1959
Withdrawn 08/01/1988
Time in Service 28 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 17/08/1959
52A Gateshead 4w/e 20/07/1968
   Withdrawn 08/01/1988

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/08/1959 To Service To service as D2066
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03066    
08/01/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 03066    

prev prev