Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 167 Today
» 1283 Yesterday
» 3933 Week
» 26914 Month
» 390159 Year
» 466746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D207 23/07/1958
TOPS (Tops) 40007 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 23/07/1958
Withdrawn 27/02/1983
Time in Service 24 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1984
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Information Derailment damage(at Llandudno Junction)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 23/07/1958
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 23/04/1966
91M To London Midland Region w/e 19/08/1967
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 19/08/1967
8J Allerton w/e 06/04/1968
D08 Liverpool Division 17/06/1968
D10 Preston Division w/e 08/05/1971
HM Healey Mills 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 27/02/1983


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/07/1958 To Service To service as D207
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
06/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40007    
01/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
27/02/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 40007    
01/01/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev