Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2456 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15862 Week
» 68878 Month
» 188405 Year
» 3215258 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D207 |
23/07/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40007 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
23/07/1958 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
27/02/1983 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Derailment damage(at Llandudno Junction) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
23/07/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/07/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/01/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D207 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40007 |
|
|
31/01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40007 |
|
|
01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|