Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2070 02/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 02/10/1959
Withdrawn 28/11/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Cut Up 01/07/2001
Cut At Cotswold Rail (at Gloucester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51C West Hartlepool (New) 02/10/1959
51L Thornaby 4w/e 17/07/1965
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 25/02/1967
51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967
   Withdrawn 28/11/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/10/1959 To Service To service as D2070
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C)
   
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
28/11/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D2070    
01/07/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Cotswold Rail: at Gloucester    

prev prev